CRAWSHAY'S WELSH RUGBY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help young people, through the provision of leisure time activities, and in particular participation in organised invitational rugby union games and other activities so as to develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individual members of society; and in the interests of social welfare to improve their conditions of life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 09 November 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD IAN JAMES BRICE | Chair | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW WILLIAM de MAID | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ANDREW EDWARDS | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAWSON KENNETH EVANS | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY JOHN HENDERSON WOODS | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LLOYD REES | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Michael Dacey | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Rodney Davies | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.60k | £34.61k | £39.62k | £65.65k | £43.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.70k | £721 | £92.27k | £78.01k | £45.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 09 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, AND IN PARTICULAR PARTICIPATION IN ORGANISED INVITATIONAL RUGBY UNION GAMES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES: (A) SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; AND (B) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Redwood Court
Llanishen
Cardiff
Cardiff
South Glamorgan
cf14 5rd
- Phone:
- 02921407052
- Email:
- mrandmadavies@live.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window