THE SOLIHULL BOROUGH TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a weekly newstape for the blind & partially sighted of the Borough
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Solihull
Governance
- 12 May 1977: Standard registration
- S B T N A (Working name)
- SOLIHULL TALKING NEWSPAPER (Working name)
- SOLIHULL TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY SHERIDAN | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
WARWICK HALL | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|||||
SUZANNE LAUREL FLETCHER | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JULIE BIRCH | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIE BARROWS | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOSEPHINE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER OSKIERA | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
LINDA FLORENCE | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Carrington-Porter | Trustee | 11 March 2014 |
|
|||||
JOHN mcDONALD | Trustee | 11 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS DALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER STARLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.04k | £990 | £2.39k | £2.37k | £2.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.66k | £4.56k | £1.00k | £3.56k | £3.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APRIL 1977 AS AMENDED 2 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES, OR OTHER SUITABLE RECORDING MEDIA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE THE METROPOLITAN BRGH OF SOLIHULL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 9
456 Station Road
Dorridge
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B93 8EX
- Phone:
- 01564776734
- Email:
- mcdonaldjohn001@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window