ST ANNS ADVICE GROUP

Charity number: 1163512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

provider of some aspects of social welfare law

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottingham City
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 September 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ST ANNS ADVICE CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Folasade Abiodun Sowunmi Trustee 18 August 2022
CHASE NC LTD
Received: On time
Robert Bird Trustee 04 February 2021
CHASE NC LTD
Received: On time
Rev ANTHONY GILES Trustee 01 October 2015
CHASE NC LTD
Received: On time
SAMUEL EDEN CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
GRANT EVERITT Trustee 11 September 2015
CHASE NC LTD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.69m £1.66m £1.63m £1.78m £1.12m
Total expenditure £1.73m £1.59m £1.63m £1.67m £1.10m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £368.54k £307.93k £328.82k £385.73k £106.98k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £37.60k £72.94k £57.94k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.68m £1.66m £957 £1.71m £1.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £144 £107 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £1.25k £984 £0 £300 £16
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.73m £1.59m £1.63m £1.67m £1.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £2.99k £797
Expenditure - Governance £0 £25.06k £26.57k £30.22k £31.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £133.28k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £14.99k £28.61k £21.02k £13.03k £5.43k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £217.37k £218.30k £236.50k £338.29k £357.09k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £85.13k £26.03k £43.15k £32.00k £24.92k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 April 2023 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 April 2023 62 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 March 2022 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 March 2022 53 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE
ROBIN HOOD CHASE
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 4EZ
Phone:
01159506867