GLOBAL BLOOD FUND (EUROPE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Global Blood Fund aims to support blood services in resource constrained countries to better serve their patient populations. It does this through the provision of training, equipment, grants and other services. The charity also works to increase the number of volunteer blood donors and provides industry leadership to improve awareness of global inequities and encourage resource sharing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cameroon
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Rwanda
- United States
Governance
- 28 July 2015: CIO registration
- GBF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN ARMITAGE | Chair | 15 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
RANDALL STARK | Trustee | 15 February 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.12k | £244.94k | £61.63k | £132.38k | £52.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £321.32k | £378.90k | £160.34k | £209.54k | £214.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES IN PARTICULAR BY IMPROVING THE AVAILABILITY OF SUFFICIENT, SAFE BLOOD FOR PATIENTS IN NEED OF TRANSFUSION, WHEREVER IN THE WORLD THEY LIVE, BUT WITH A FOCUS ON POORER COUNTRIES, THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, EQUIPMENT, MONEY AND OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT. B) THE PROMOTION AND FACILITATION OF VOLUNTARY, NON-REMUNERATED BLOOD DONATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Global Blood Fund
124-128 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07711447242
- Email:
- info@globalbloodfund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window