THE HORNCASTLE TOWN FOOTBALL CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- to provide facilities for, and to promote participation in, the amateur sport of football in Horncastle and the surrounding area; - to establish and maintain a permanent amateur club in Horncastle for the teaching, playing and coaching of football; - to provide suitably qualified coaches, coaching courses, insurance, medical treatment and post-match refreshments; and - to affiliate to the FA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 02 November 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Mellor | Chair | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Erik Rawdon | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gregory Shinn | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Maria Fawcett | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jack Paul Kimber | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee Nickless | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
COLIN HUGH LOW | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Liam Matthew Stephenson | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW NEIL COTTON | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MARK JOHNSON | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.47k | £41.77k | £44.94k | £106.82k | £87.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.85k | £29.02k | £35.38k | £93.06k | £84.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 May 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 22 May 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 JUN 2013
Charitable objects
(1) THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE COMPANY IS TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR AND TO PROMOTE PARTICIPATION IN THE AMATEUR SPORT OF FOOTBALL IN HORNCASTLE, LINCOLNSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. (2) TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A PERMANENT AMATEUR CLUB IN HORNCASTLE FOR THE TEACHING, PLAYING AND COACHING OF FOOTBALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HORNCASTLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. (3) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR FOOTBALL AND TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND FACILITATE THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL IN THE AREA OF HORNCASTLE AND AMONGST THE COMMUNITY. (4) TO PROVIDE THE ORDINARY BENEFITS OF BELONGING TO A SPORTS CLUB AS SET OUT IN SCHEDULE 18 OF THE FINANCE ACT 2002 INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THE PROVISION OF SUITABLY QUALIFIED COACHES, COACHING COURSES, INSURANCE, MEDICAL TREATMENT AND POST MATCH REFRESHMENTS. (5) TO AFFILIATE TO THE FA AND PARENT COUNTY ASSOCIATION AND TO COMPLY WITH AND UPHOLD THE RULES AND REGULATIONS OF BOTH ORGANISATIONS AS AMENDED FROM TIME TO TIME
Contact information
- Address:
-
HORNCASTLE FOOTBALL CLUB
THE WONG
HORNCASTLE
LINCOLNSHIRE
LN9 6EA
- Phone:
- 01507522607
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window