Financial history HARLEY'S HOUNDS ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1161902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/01/2020 04/01/2021 04/01/2022 04/01/2023 04/01/2024
Total gross income £40.63k £22.06k £37.60k £51.27k £55.44k
Total expenditure £38.15k £15.23k £39.79k £51.20k £64.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A