HARLEY'S HOUNDS ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Removing dogs from pounds and or abusive situations for the purpose of rehoming. To ensure all dogs rescued are de-sexed and receive the veterinary treatment needed before placing them in a permanent family home. To ensure all dogs receive life time back up so they don't ever return to the same situation they've been rescued from.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 May 2015: CIO registration
- HHDR (Working name)
- HARLEY'S HOUNDS DOG RESCUE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naomi Field-Jones | Chair | 28 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Emily Mary Yorke | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Hawthorne | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Della Dawson | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/01/2020 | 04/01/2021 | 04/01/2022 | 04/01/2023 | 04/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.63k | £22.06k | £37.60k | £51.27k | £55.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.15k | £15.23k | £39.79k | £51.20k | £64.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 January 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 January 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 95 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 January 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 04 January 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 29 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2018 AMENDED ON 20 JUN 2018 as amended on 19 May 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE & FOSTER HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Whitebeam Close
Branston
BURTON-ON-TRENT
Staffordshire
DE14 3QU
- Phone:
- 07456563848
- Email:
- info@harleyshounds.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window