EBOR VALE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1162289
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide Horse Riding and Carriage Driving facilities for adults and children with disabilities.The core purpose of this Charity is to benefit their health and well-being through the delivery of effective and life-enhancing therapy, the opportunity to learn new skills and achieve personal goals and ambitions; and the chance to enjoy taking part in a pleasurable social activity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £17,496
Total expenditure: £24,608

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 June 2015: CIO registration
  • 02 March 2017: Funds received from 1074239 EBOR VALE GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATIO...
  • 01 August 2024: Funds transferred to 244108 RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING ...
  • 01 August 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • EBOR VALE RDA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £32.43k £29.48k £28.60k £22.85k £17.50k
Total expenditure £28.76k £20.42k £21.35k £15.73k £24.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.86k £4.02k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 May 2024 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 May 2024 99 days late
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On Time