PAMOJA LEO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit for the prevention or relief of poverty, advocacy of child welfare and improvement of education for residents of Tanzania. Specifically by working with our sister organisation Pamoja Leo to provide funding for their projects to enhance the education of children and young adults and to provide welfare support for Orphans and Vulnerable Children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Tanzania
Governance
- 16 July 2015: CIO registration
- TOGETHER TODAY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abel Okello | Chair | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniela Bowry-Blum | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Smith | Trustee | 23 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Rhodes | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD HILL MSC | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA HARRIS-HILL BSC | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.12k | £100.35k | £123.00k | £111.45k | £124.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.53k | £95.49k | £123.03k | £131.59k | £119.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 16 JUL 2015 AMENDED ON 16 JUL 2015
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR RESIDENTS IN TANZANIA; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PRIMARILY CHILDREN IN TANZANIA AND THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 VICTOR ROAD
TEDDINGTON
TW11 8SP
- Phone:
- 02032870016
- Email:
- edward@pamojaleo.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window