ILE CULTURAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the Afro-Brazilian Martial Art Capoeira, running workshops, festivals as well as launching museums, books, CD's and documentaries to raise awareness of the activity. Supporting financially when possible the old Masters in need. Projects that use Capoeira for integration and rehabilitation. Support the fight against poverty. Support ecological sustainability areas and projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Carmarthenshire
- City Of Swansea
- Vale Of Glamorgan
- Angola
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Cape Verde
- Costa Rica
- Haiti
- Ireland
- Italy
- Jersey
- Malawi
- Martinique
- Portugal
- United States
Governance
- 01 September 2015: Standard registration
- ILE CULTURAL (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE ROBERTS | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN JOHN CRIDLAND | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
LLIAN TREW | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID R SMALL | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.70k | £10.20k | £10.40k | £3.70k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.75k | £10.91k | £7.12k | £3.56k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/12/2013 AS AMENDED ON 21/06/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AFRO-BRAZILIAN MARTIAL ART CAPOEIRA AND ITS ASSOCIATED PERFORMING ARTS, MUSIC AND DANCES AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF OTHER BRAZILIAN ARTS AND BRAZILIAN CULTURE, IN PARTICULAR TRADITIONAL BRAZILIAN FOLK DANCES, TRADITIONAL CRAFTS, MUSIC, SINGING AND LITERATURE BY THE PROVISION OF PERFORMANCES, LECTURES AND WORKSHOPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
69
Rhyddings Park Road
Brynmill
Swansea
Swansea
SA2 0AF
- Phone:
- 07757116730
- Email:
- ILEFOUNDATION@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window