THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AUGUSTINE, TOOTING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of activities for different age and need groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 11 June 2015: Previously excepted registration
- ST AUGUSTINE, TOOTING PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Angela Rayner | Chair | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
JULIANA SMITH | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Idene Waithe | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
BERNICE BAIRD-DUNDAS | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
THERESA PAYNE | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MCGREGOR | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
STEVE PAYNE | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL GEOFFREY YATES | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ETHEL ADDO | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLAUDETTE DEY | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Doris Pappoe | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Alice Jane Phillips | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathie Gittens | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE OBODAI | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Victoria Frances Duxbury | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.18k | £72.73k | £225.23k | £128.59k | £134.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.50k | £91.31k | £101.70k | £93.86k | £112.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2025 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2025 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2024 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2024 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2022 | 358 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2022 | 358 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Augustines Church & Church Hall
16-18 Broadwater Road
LONDON
SW17 0EF
- Phone:
- 02086724790
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window