INTERNATIONAL FISCAL ASSOCIATION UK CONGRESS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of the public in international taxation in such ways as the trustees think fit including: organising congresses of the International Fiscal Association in the UK; promoting discussion of international tax matters at the same; providing financial assistance to UK tax academics to attend the same; promoting dissemination of knowledge generated by the same.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joy Elisabeth Svasti-Salee | Chair | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ASHLEY GREENBANK | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Woolf Baker KC | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|||||
JEFFREY GRAHAM CONNELL | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROLAND ALEXANDER JUPP SOLICITOR | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER CHARLES DAVIDSON | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.20m | £334 | £2.99k | £10.91k | £11.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.07m | £4.20k | £2.12k | £3.58k | £4.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.20m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.07m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1 THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF INTERNATIONAL TAXATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): 1.1 BY ORGANISING SUCH INTERNATIONAL TAX CONGRESSES OF THE INTERNATIONAL FISCAL ASSOCIATION AS ARE FROM TIME TO TIME HELD IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; 1.2 BY PROMOTING THE DISCUSSION OF INTERNATIONAL TAX MATTERS BETWEEN REPRESENTATIVES OF INDUSTRY, THE PROFESSIONS, TAX ADMINISTRATIONS, INTERNATIONAL ORGANISATIONS AND ACADEMIA THROUGH THE HOLDING OF SUCH CONGRESSES WITH A VIEW TO ENHANCING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF SUCH MATTERS; 1.3 BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENCOURAGE THE PARTICIPATION OF MEMBERS OF ACADEMIC INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AT SUCH CONGRESSES; 1.4 BY PROMOTING THE DISSEMINATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF THE KNOWLEDGE GENERATED BY SUCH CONGRESSES SO THAT IT IS MORE WIDELY AVAILABLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 1.5 BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO OTHER CONFERENCES HELD IN THE UNITED KINGDOM TO DISCUSS INTERNATIONAL TAX MATTERS WITH A VIEW TO ENHANCING THE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF SUCH MATTERS; 1.6 BY ENCOURAGING ACADEMIC STUDIES AND SCHOLARSHIP ACHIEVEMENTS IN THE FIELD OF INTERNATIONAL TAXATION AND THE PUBLICATION OF WORK GENERATED BY SUCH ACTIVITIES; AND 1.7 BY SUPPORTING THE EDUCATIONAL WORK OF THE INTERNATIONAL FISCAL ASSOCIATION IN THE FIELD OF INTERNATIONAL TAXATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND 2 OTHER SUCH PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Ellwood Road
BEACONSFIELD
Buckinghamshire
HP9 1EN
- Phone:
- 07802804403
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window