AGAPE TOWER

Charity number: 1163808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of the trust is to advance the Christian religion by preaching the Gospel of God about His only Son, Jesus Christ.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £29,233
Total expenditure: £36,699

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • AGAPE LIFE CHAPEL INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sheriff Anabah Trustee 22 February 2024
None on record
EMMA Avagah Trustee 14 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £42.22k £39.84k £9.26k £48.22k £29.23k
Total expenditure £45.36k £27.16k £20.23k £41.22k £36.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 02 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 10 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 18 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Civic Quarter Car Park
Mezzanine Floor
College Road
Doncaster
DN1 3JH
Phone:
01302278715