FRIENDS FOR LIFE BEDFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of people in care homes within the unitary boroughs of Bedford, Central Beds. and Luton or any area previously defined as being within Bedfordshire by any or all of the following: (i) developing schemes for befriending residents (ii) assisting care homes in meeting the spiritual needs of residents, in particular to help them in meeting their statutory requirements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,336 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 24 February 2016: Standard registration
- 31 October 2024: Funds received from 1158654 CARE HOME VOLUNTEERS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suneil Shashikant Khandke | Chair | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Wheatley | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Titilayo Sharon Majekodunmi | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen David Bennett | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Rochelle Lindfield | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ames Ridley | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nafiz Hasnat | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keyur Bhatt | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.91k | £43.08k | £57.14k | £56.19k | £75.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.04k | £28.01k | £51.77k | £50.41k | £86.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.21k | £12.00k | £6.25k | £5.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/02/2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE IN CARE HOMES AND OTHER SIMILAR ESTABLISHMENTS WITHIN THE UNITARY BOROUGHS OF BEDFORD, CENTRAL BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON OR ANY AREA PREVIOUSLY DEFINED AS BEING WITHIN THE COUNTY OF BEDFORDSHIRE BY ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING: (I) DEVELOPING SCHEMES FOR BEFRIENDING RESIDENTS (II) ASSISTING SUCH HOMES IN MEETING THE SPIRITUAL NEEDS OF RESIDENTS, IN PARTICULAR TO HELP THEM IN MEETING THE STATUTORY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS FIELD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Room1
2nd floor
43 Bromham Road
BEDFORD
Bedfordshire
- Phone:
- 07460575410
- Email:
- hello@friendsforlife.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window