SHIFT NATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance the Christian religion for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings, lectures, religious festivals, producing literature and media on Christianity to enlighten others, especially but not exclusively young adults in the 20/30 age group, about the Christian religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 March 2016: CIO registration
- SHIFT (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hugh Edmund Chichester | Chair | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather McCormick | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MIA LOUISE SKELLY | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Colvin | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PRECIOUS OMOREGIE | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.44k | £8.64k | £6.08k | £4.44k | £28.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.98k | £339 | £1.51k | £17.25k | £28.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING LITERATURE AND MEDIA ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG ADULTS IN THE 20O30 AGE GROUP, ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Pember Road
LONDON
NW10 5LP
- Phone:
- +44 7795 262848
- Email:
- info@shift-uk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window