Financial history AFRICAN CARIBBEAN HERITAGE CENTRE

Charity Number: 1165149
Charity reporting is overdue by 1540 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023
Total gross income £0 £1.69k £0 £0 £48.36k
Total expenditure £3.25k £2.62k £0 £0 £21.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A