Financial history DJANGO GIRLS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163260
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £20.85k £15.56k £17.00k £15.57k £22.71k
Total expenditure £19.81k £14.38k £22.28k £13.28k £20.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A