DJANGO GIRLS FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity focused on growing its community of volunteer workshop organisers as well as improving and promoting our free online resources for women to learn programming.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
362 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Islington
- Manchester City
- Milton Keynes
- Oxfordshire
- Argentina
- Australia
- Belgium
- Benin
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Chile
- Colombia
- Dominican Republic
- Ecuador
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Hungary
- India
- Iran
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Kenya
- Kyrgyzstan
- Lithuania
- Madagascar
- Mexico
- Moldova
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- Serbia
- Sierra Leone
- Slovakia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Thailand
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 24 August 2015: CIO registration
- DJANGO GIRLS FOUNDATION OF AWESOME, CUPCAKES, AND EMOJI; DGF; DGFACE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leona Wing Yee So | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Makarudze | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachell Calhoun | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aisha Bello | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Wicher | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.85k | £15.56k | £17.00k | £15.57k | £22.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.81k | £14.38k | £22.28k | £13.28k | £20.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 February 2025 | 296 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 February 2025 | 296 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 September 2024 | 512 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 September 2024 | 512 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 June 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 June 2021 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WOMEN IN THE SUBJECT OF COMPUTER SCIENCE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF PROGRAMMING WORKSHOPS AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Northolt Fold
HEYWOOD
OL10 2WH
- Phone:
- 07599669809
- Email:
- hello@djangogirls.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window