PHOENIX SPORTS AND RECREATION (ROTHERHAM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide Sports/Recreational Facilities open to members and the general public. Inclusive of: 18 hole golf course Football Weight Training Badminton Squash Table Tennis Snooker Pool Indoor Bowls Outdoor Bowls Archery Boxing Drama
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£1,554,001
Donations and legacies | £5.48k | |
Charitable activities | £518.28k | |
Other trading activities | £1.02m | |
Investments | £6.38k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,565,012
Raising funds | £805.76k | |
Charitable activities | £759.25k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £805.76k | |
Charitable expenditure | £759.25k |
People

45 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rotherham
Governance
- 26 April 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allan Lewis | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Walker | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN READ | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER SPENCELEY | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUSTIN SCOTT CARPENTER | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH DYSON | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEIL WATKINS | Trustee | 18 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.47m | £1.21m | £1.23m | £1.37m | £1.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.53m | £1.24m | £1.20m | £1.48m | £1.57m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £121.88k | £206.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £7.41k | £4.78k | £24.54k | £2.54k | £5.48k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £985.94k | £654.99k | £534.96k | £886.61k | £1.02m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £475.07k | £545.29k | £659.12k | £471.16k | £518.28k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.31k | £5.14k | £5.01k | £5.05k | £6.38k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £721.63k | £622.12k | £626.03k | £739.46k | £759.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £808.58k | £621.54k | £575.02k | £740.62k | £805.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.60m | £3.58m | £3.52m | £3.49m | £3.43m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £187.89k | £209.26k | £260.18k | £178.38k | £236.14k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £221.62k | £249.75k | £219.26k | £215.79k | £231.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 FEB 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BADMINTON, BOWLS, CRICKET, FOOTBALL, GOLF, INDOOR BOWLS, SQUASH, WEIGHT LIFTING, TABLE TENNIS OR OTHER AMATEUR SPORTS PROMOTING HEALTH AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE; 4.2 THE PROMOTION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE COMMUNITY; 4.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH; 4.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND CULTURE AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROMOTING DRAMA AND OPERA; 4.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN AMATEUR SPORTS AND HEALTH; AND 4.6 THE PRESERVATION CONSERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF RAVENFIELD PARK AS A PUBLIC AMENITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pavilion Lane
Brinsworth
ROTHERHAM
S60 5PA
- Phone:
- 01709363788
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window