SUSSEX CRICKET FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As Sussex Crickets charitable arm, our aim is to actively change lives through cricket across the communities of Sussex. We use the game and the Sussex Cricket brand to deliver accessible and enjoyable opportunities that grow the sport, tackle inequalities, improve health and wellbeing and enable people to fulfil their potential. Through our activities we look to make cricket accessible to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income:
£1,140,326
Donations and legacies | £214.13k | |
Charitable activities | £240.45k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.86k | |
Other | £681.89k |
Total expenditure:
£1,082,941
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.08m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.08m | |
Retained for future use | £57.39k |
People

24 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 13 July 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR Ish Jalal | Chair | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Ives | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Batchelor | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anju Chauhan | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phil Smith | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Main | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Anne Bandy | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John RT Barclay | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Libby Ager | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Katy Cooper | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andy Dalby-Welsh | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL RUSSELL | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02m | £810.53k | £853.49k | £1.09m | £1.14m | |
|
Total expenditure | £951.17k | £803.25k | £723.52k | £974.06k | £1.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £141.29k | £115.92k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £242.37k | £38.09k | £37.77k | £169.86k | £214.13k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £121.73k | £114.16k | £120.66k | £273.76k | £240.45k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.86k | |
|
Income - Other | £651.29k | £658.28k | £695.05k | £648.59k | £681.89k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £150.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £951.17k | £803.25k | £723.52k | £974.06k | £1.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.25k | £9.19k | £9.91k | £11.86k | £12.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £599.57k | £505.45k | £477.89k | £64.45k | £78.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £286.03k | £356.23k | £372.94k | £538.46k | £531.08k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £138.33k | £201.25k | £87.98k | £135.34k | £70.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 MAY 2015 as amended on 24 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF SCF ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO: A. TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING AND SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING CRICKET AND OTHER SPORTS (?FACILITIES? MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); B. TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, AND; C. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND SPECIFICALLY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sussex County Cricket Club
Eaton Road
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 3AN
- Phone:
- 01273827100
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window