FITZGERALD FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity supports any charities and promotes any charitable purpose for the benefit of the general public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £404,300
Total expenditure: £423,509

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Australia
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN CHARLES FITZGERALD Chair 03 August 2015
None on record
JULIE ANN FITZGERALD Trustee 04 August 2015
None on record
ANDREW FRANCIS WILSON BA, MA Trustee 29 July 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £146.72k £144.56k £171.25k £135.51k £404.30k
Total expenditure £154.70k £160.17k £189.44k £153.62k £423.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 CLABON MEWS
LONDON
SW1X 0EJ
Phone:
02075848874
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available