Financial history FOREST OF DEAN ATHLETIC CLUB

Charity number: 1164100
Charity reporting is up to date (40 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.33k £8.76k £13.10k £14.99k £11.13k
Total expenditure £25.99k £10.71k £10.99k £12.44k £16.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A