PHIL'S KIDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise awareness, offer support and provide grants to help fund pre-implantation genetic diagnosis in-vitro fertilization (PGT-IVF) for people at risk of Huntington's Disease (HD).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 August 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELYN M STAVISH BA Hons SW | Chair | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN M WILSON | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr DYLAN J E STAVISH PhD | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHOEBE L STAVISH BA Hns PSY | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHLOE M POSKITT BA Hns LLB | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.82k | £3.02k | £2.15k | £1.20k | £6.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.96k | £1.98k | £3.04k | £2.98k | £5.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 September 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 29 September 2021 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH OF INDIVIDUALS AND THEIR FAMILIES OF PEOPLE AT RISK OF HUNTINGTON’S DISEASE(HD) AND THOSE ALREADY SUFFERING BY, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, · PROMOTING SAFE, MEDICALLY SANCTIONED AND PROVEN METHODS OF REPRODUCTION FOR PEOPLE AT RISK OR SUFFERING FROM HD TO HAVE HD-FREE CHILDREN. · PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY FOR THOSE AT RISK OR SUFFERING FROM HD TO ACCESS MEDICALLY SANCTIONED AND PROVEN METHODS FOR THE REPRODUCTION OF HD-FREE CHILDREN. · HELPING TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING, EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL, OF PEOPLE SUFFERING OR AT RISK OF HD SURROUNDING THEIR REPRODUCTIVE CHOICES. AT THIS TIME THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA IS LIMITED TO THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GRANGE
CHURCH LANE
AUSTERFIELD
DONCASTER
DN10 6QY
- Phone:
- 01302719737
- Email:
- Phils.kids54@gmail.com
- Website:
-
philskids.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window