LANGBAURGH TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a monthly talking newspaper for blind and visually impaired people living in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 10 June 1977: Standard registration
- LANGBAURGH TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND (Working name)
- BITS AND PIECES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Clayton | Chair | 04 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Turner | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RAE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £270 | £2 | £27 | £14 | £213 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.71k | £514 | £476 | £531 | £495 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 20/04/1977 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR THE PARTIALLY BLIND OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LANGBAURGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 MALCOLM GROVE
REDCAR
TS10 2DJ
- Phone:
- 01642472287
- Email:
- dandjrae24@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window