HYTHE TRIANGLE COMMUNITY GARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To promote the conservation and protection of the Grade II listed former animal pound in Hythe, Kent 2. To provide facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation by providing an area for use as a community garden and other activities for individuals in Hythe and the surrounds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 14 August 2015: CIO registration
- HYTHE ANIMAL POUND (Working name)
- HYTHE TRIANGLE HERITAGE GROUP (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CRISPIN DAVIES | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Terence Ellames | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Ward | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY TANTON | Trustee | 14 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY MAGUIRE | Trustee | 14 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50 | £4.50k | £2.93k | £2.63k | £4.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £689 | £416 | £6.79k | £4.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k | £1.80k | N/A | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE GRADE II LISTED FORMER ANIMAL POUND IN HYTHE KENT; AND 2) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION BY PROVIDING AN AREA FOR USE AS A COMMUNITY GARDEN AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS IN HYTHE AND THE SURROUNDS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HYTHE AND THE SURROUNDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 St. Leonards Road
HYTHE
CT21 6EN
- Phone:
- 07780850076
- Email:
- hello@htcg.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window