Accounts and annual returns FARNHAM COMMON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1163417
Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2022 334 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window