Financial history FARNHAM COMMON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1163417
Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £30.77k £41.09k £21.58k £29.76k £22.88k
Total expenditure £41.71k £25.08k £32.07k £18.44k £18.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.10k £11.48k £17.77k £2.67k