SARACEN SPORTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of and participation in archery training and events,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 01 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAJAWAL AJMAL MPHARM | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD NAEEM SARFRAZ BSC HONS | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAVED ARSHAD KHAN BDS | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr ABDULLAH KHADBAI BCHD PG DI | Trustee | 22 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.79k | £703 | £350 | £0 | £3.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.82k | £442 | £444 | £380 | £1.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 159 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 159 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 525 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 525 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PURSUIT OF ARCHERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Butternab Road
HUDDERSFIELD
HD4 7AR
- Phone:
- 01484517241
- Email:
- club@saracensports.org
- Website:
-
saracensports.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window