STAR THROWERS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Star Throwers supports people with cancer and their carers through personalised information that helps them to become well informed about their cancer and their treatment options, and through complementary support services that meets their holistic needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Norfolk
Governance
- 16 June 2015: CIO registration
- 27 June 2017: Funds received from 1127037 THE STAR THROWERS
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Celia Frances Lynne | Chair | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Peek | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Denzel Boateng | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Mills | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tonia Dawson OBE | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robin Upfold | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Betts | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.88k | £169.87k | £264.01k | £243.17k | £457.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.32k | £188.61k | £261.68k | £301.82k | £306.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.84k | £54.62k | £2.29k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 April 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 28 April 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 October 2022 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 26 October 2022 | 209 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CANCER SUFFERERS BY; A) THE PROVISION AND ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE ON THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF CANCER B) PROVIDING ACCESS TO THERAPEUTIC CARE AND ASSISTANCE C) CARRYING OUT RESEARCH AND PUBLISHING ANY USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STAR THROWERS
30 MELTON ROAD
WYMONDHAM
NR18 0DB
- Phone:
- 01953423304
- Email:
- info@starthrowers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window