WEST WICKHAM AND SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All activities associated with a church within the Baptist Union of Great Britain
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 April 2016: CIO registration
- 19 September 2019: Funds received from 1126890 WEST WICKHAM & SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH
- WWSBC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Peter Hills | Chair | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
June George | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Anne Boggust | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Okechukwu Nzelu | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Warren Bradbury | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clifford John Underhay | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev Sara Jodi Kennett | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Philip David Jenkins | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Neil Christmas Selby Mr | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £299.70k | £203.14k | £227.23k | £206.23k | £262.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £230.45k | £207.20k | £235.33k | £210.36k | £329.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £22.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 27 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Wickham & Shirley Baptist Ch
Wickham Road
CROYDON
CR0 8EH
- Phone:
- 02087775705
- Email:
- office@wwsbc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window