TRANSCENDENTAL MEDITATION PROGRAMME WALES

Charity Number: 506374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information about and instruction in Transcendental Meditation (TM) as taught by Maharishi Yogi. Offers improved health, wellbeing and development of higher states of consciousness for the individual and society through TM, advanced techniques, Ayur Veda and Stapathya Veda. Offers Consciousness Based Education by providing TM to schools and other educational establishments.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 27 March 2024

Total income: £6,000
Total expenditure: £5,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MAHARISHI FOUNDATION WALES (Working name)
  • TRANSCENDENTAL MEDITATION WALES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYN JONES Trustee 25 January 2012
None on record
TERRENCE WILLIAM MILLARD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/03/2020 27/03/2021 27/03/2022 27/03/2023 27/03/2024
Total gross income £7.50k £4.50k £10.48k £7.60k £6.00k
Total expenditure £6.00k £2.70k £7.04k £6.00k £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 March 2024 28 January 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 27 March 2023 29 September 2024 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 27 March 2022 01 May 2023 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 27 March 2021 15 March 2022 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 27 March 2020 27 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Duxford Close
Radyr Way
Cardiff
Cardiff
Cardiff
CF5 2PR
Phone:
02921158968
Website:

TM.org.uk