THE PINK FESTIVAL GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the elimination of discrimination in particular on the grounds of sexual orientation or gender identification; advancing education and raising awareness in equality and diversity; promoting activities to foster understanding between people from diverse backgrounds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £12,900 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Herefordshire
- Leicestershire
- Norfolk
- Northamptonshire
- Suffolk
Governance
- 25 August 2015: CIO registration
- THE PINK FESTIVAL OR PINK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL EDWARD HYDE-CLARKE | Chair | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mx Deborah Joy Luxon | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Owens | Trustee | 30 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ferguson | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Bateman | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR WILLIAM WILSON | Trustee | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.05k | £56.55k | £0 | £1.35k | £72.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.12k | £51.58k | £438 | £2.49k | £72.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.00k | £29.40k | N/A | N/A | £12.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 January 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 January 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 December 2020 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 December 2020 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING BY: A. THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION IN PARTICULAR ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTIFICATION; B. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; C. PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS (IN PARTICULAR IN RESPECT OF THEIR SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTIFICATION); AND D. CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING EXCLUDED (PARTICULARLY AS A RESULT OF THEIR SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTIFICATION), RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED (PARTICULARLY AS A RESULT OF THEIR SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTIFICATION) AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pink Festival Group, Office A
The Marlborough Club
High Street
NEWMARKET
Suffolk
CB8 8UG
- Phone:
- 07827967370
- Email:
- info@thepinkfestival.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window