BIRCHLEY ST. MARYS SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money through events to enhance local primary school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- St Helens
Governance
- 14 September 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALLISON SMITH | Trustee | 04 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.34k | £5.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.19k | £6.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 297 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 297 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 663 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 663 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1028 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1028 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1393 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1393 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1758 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1758 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/05/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 CORONATION WALK
BILLINGE
WIGAN
WN5 7QE
- Phone:
- 07703130100
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window