THE MURRAY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY PROVIDES FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO UNIVERSITY STUDENTS IN THE UK AND EUROPE TO SUPPORT THEM IN DEVELOPING THEIR STUDIES THROUGH PARTICIPATING IN EUROPEAN PROJECTS RELATING PREDOMINANTLY TO ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS. SO FOR EXAMPLE, SUPPORT COULD BE PROVIDED TO COVER MISSION COSTS, PARTICIPATION IN CONGRESSES, PROJECT MEETINGS AND OTHER EXPENSES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 June 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CHARLES NICHOLAS MURRAY | Chair | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ILAN MARDIX | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Damien George Smith | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN HERBERT FURNESS | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr GHISLAINE ESTELLE MURRAY | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES NICHOLAS MURRAY | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
STUART RICHARD MURRAY | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANTHONY JOHN MURRAY | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.48k | £71.51k | £16.86k | £23.29k | £37.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.15k | £70.90k | £45.09k | £27.13k | £36.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 December 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 December 2022 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 NOV 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION. WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR THE EDUCATION OR TRAINING OF SUCH PERSONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION; AND SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY (BY ORDINARY RESOLUTION) DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HORTON HOUSE
EXCHANGE FLAGS
LIVERPOOL
MERSEYSIDE
L2 3YL
- Phone:
- 01516003079
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window