Pug Life Rescue


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has opened an inquiry Open in new window into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a breed specific registered charity based in the UK, actively rescuing pugs and pug crosses in need wherever they may be. We seek to end the suffering of pugs being exploited or neglected, neuter and promote healthy living for pugs with our wonderful network of volunteers, adopters and foster parents across the UK. We work closely with other animal welfare organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 October 2015: CIO registration
- MUFFIN PUG RESCUE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Fox | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNE BAKER | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Elizabeth Chandler | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Conway | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Fullerton | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.28k | £438.16k | £753.08k | £359.73k | £166.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.01k | £438.11k | £754.93k | £402.48k | £118.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £747.85k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £5.23k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £6 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £595.68k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £5.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £154.11k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 17 November 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2022
(These accounts |
17 November 2023 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 23 October 2023 | 388 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2021
(These accounts |
23 October 2023 | 388 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 07 October 2023 | 737 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2020
(These accounts |
07 October 2023 | 737 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 07 October 2023 | 1102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2019
(These accounts |
07 October 2023 | 1102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 19 Oct 2015 as amended on 18 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF PUGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING CARE AND TREATMENT OF THE PUGS AND SEEKING TO SUITABLY RE-HOME THEM; 2) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS PUGS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR PUGS THAT ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF MALTREATMENT, SICKNESS POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO DOG WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG DOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pug Life Rescue
PO Box 290
SY23 9DJ
- Phone:
- 0300 365 9600
- Email:
- Info@pugliferescue.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window