DINEFWR INDOOR BOWLS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote and provide facilities for the amateur sport of bowls, in Ammanford and surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 07 September 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEN BURTON JP BURTON PRESIDENT | Chair | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Richards-Evans | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Davies | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN CHILCOTT CHILCOTT | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/04/2020 | 14/04/2021 | 14/04/2022 | 14/04/2023 | 14/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.05k | £12.24k | £27.47k | £39.41k | £51.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.53k | £8.07k | £23.15k | £36.78k | £46.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £4.80k | £4.98k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 April 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 07 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AMMANFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OF WALES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING THE SPORT OF BOWLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DINEFWR INDOOR BOWLS CLUB
MANOR ROAD
AMMANFORD
SA18 3AP
- Phone:
- 01269597754
- Email:
- dinefwrbowls@gmail.com
- Website:
-
MANORRD.AMMANFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window