NORTH LIVERPOOL AND SOUTH SEFTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Equip Churches for mission. Support & Train local preachers to spread the word of God Provision of Manse(s) and Stipend(s) for Minister(s) to enable them to perform ministry. Provides support to Churches in fulfilling financial, legal and safeguarding obligations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

35 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 04 September 2015: Previously excepted registration
- 17 June 2024: Funds received from 1195942 THE METHODIST CHURCH - LIVERPOOL (NORTH) CIRCUIT
- LIVERPOOL NORTH CENTRAL METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
35 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev IAN JOSEPH KAILI HU | Chair | 04 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
VIV MARRIOTT | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
WENDY LUNT | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SHAW | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
HILARY NESS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev SUSAN EDWARDS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SACHIN PATIL | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE SHANKS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HIRD | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STEVENS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JEAN BARNES | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
VALERIE ANNE GEE | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Neil Stubbens | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
MARGARET LANGTON | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Battersby | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
EDNA KORMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN ROXBURGH | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GENT | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
LYNETTE THOMPSON | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev HELEN KIRKUP | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA McAVOY | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ROXBURGH | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EVANS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
HILARY HENSHALL | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
WENDY THOMAS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
NORMA EVANS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH GARY THOMAS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALAN LEWIS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE ORAM | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GEORGE KIEL | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN DAVID TWIST | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
ELEANOR JOAN LEWIS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 04 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Smith BSC FCA | Trustee | 04 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILL STUBBS | Trustee | 04 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.97k | £116.27k | £83.68k | £576.73k | £114.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.17k | £120.07k | £108.02k | £118.83k | £338.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £572.59k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.14k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.01k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £118.83k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 September 2024 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 September 2024 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 March 2022 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 March 2022 | 262 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 January 2021 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 January 2021 | 199 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932 as amended on 03 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 DALEGARTH AVENUE
LIVERPOOL
L12 0AJ
- Phone:
- 01512200852
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window