ONE TO ONE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation supports evidenced based knowledge sharing for all those involved in delivering maternity care, we provide education & training to health professionals to ensure that they are equipped with the knowledge to provide the highest standard of care & community facilities to ensure that women & health professionals have appropriate environments in which to have their care or to learn.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Akrotiri
- Albania
- Andorra
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Estonia
- Faroe Islands
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Hungary
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Jersey
- Kosovo
- Latvia
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malta
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Montenegro
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- San Marino
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Ukraine
- United States
Governance
- 14 December 2015: Standard registration
- 15 March 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.39k | £143.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.12k | £143.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 12 February 2018 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/12/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS IN THE SUBJECT OF MATERNAL, FETAL AND NEONATAL HEALTH. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND ENVIRONMENTS FOR EDUCATION PURPOSES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST WOMEN BEFORE, DURING AND AFTER PREGNANCY ON THE SUBJECT OF MATERNAL, FETAL AND NEONATAL HEALTH AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC AND HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window