Financial history EVANGEL ASSEMBLIES OF GOD CHURCH

Charity number: 1162263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.12k £53.07k £38.19k £30.12k £51.25k
Total expenditure £18.55k £28.44k £12.75k £17.85k £13.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A