Financial history THE TREBLE ONE TRUST

Charity number: 1163831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.57k £1.37k £1.31k £650 £6.06k
Total expenditure £12.93k £7.22k £5.62k £8.06k £3.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A