Financial history YPI COUNSELLING

Charity number: 1163288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £321.79k £232.23k £197.56k £122.57k £256.26k
Total expenditure £324.77k £161.37k £184.45k £175.08k £196.39k
Income from government contracts £146.03k £11.40k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £79.69k £68.81k £40.91k £85.71k £89.77k