TAUNTON AREA DEBT ADVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving free impartial debt advice to clients based on the individual needs of each client and may include debt management plans, insolvency solutions and budgeting education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 June 2015: CIO registration
- TADA (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Gillett | Chair | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ruffell-Hazell | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Goss | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP BEDFORD | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.99k | £10.32k | £6.87k | £19.75k | £5.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.21k | £7.28k | £4.78k | £8.86k | £9.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS IN THE SOMERSET AREA BY ANY SUCH MEANS THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AT LAW, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING DEBT COUNSELLING AND ADJUSTING SERVICES, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN FINANCIAL MATTERS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Mary's House
Magdalene Street
Taunton
Somerset
TA1 1SB
- Phone:
- 07921526087
- Email:
- admin@tada.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window