HUBBUB THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hubbub Theatre Company works with people with learning disabilities. We are based in Derby, We run a touring theatre company, an actor training and a community project including outreach in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £54,950 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 26 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Patricia Gillott | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Bowman | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Carrie Levy | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kashif Alistair Arshad-Kay | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Parmjit Sagoo | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vickie Minion | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.38k | £211.65k | £226.19k | £195.20k | £330.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.29k | £133.21k | £210.63k | £217.40k | £303.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.57k | £123.08k | £151.88k | N/A | £54.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Oct 2015 as amended on 29 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND PROMOTE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF DRAMA. 2. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING AND/OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES BY PROVIDING THEM WITH OPPORTUNITIES TO ENGAGE IN THEATRE, DRAMA AND MOVEMENT AS A CREATIVE, SOCIAL AND EDUCATIONAL EXPERIENCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hubbub Theatre Company
Deda
19 Chapel Street
Derby
Derbyshire
DE1 3GU
- Phone:
- 01332 742587
- Email:
- info@hubbubtheatre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window