Financial history MICHAEL STREETE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £52.42k £51.96k £175.98k £179.59k £197.91k
Total expenditure £38.22k £55.94k £159.90k £64.28k £149.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £40.21k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A