Financial history LIBRARY AND RESOURCE CENTRE SUPPORTERS (LARCS), BAMPTON (DEVON)

Charity number: 1163092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.80k £2.29k £3.96k £6.02k £8.26k
Total expenditure £7.06k £4.11k £6.33k £7.38k £6.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £150 N/A N/A N/A N/A