CITY HARVEST

Charity number: 1163055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

City Harvest helps put surplus food to good use in a sustainable way, by distributing to organisations that feed the hungry in London

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 August 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Freeston Chair 18 June 2024
None on record
Stephen Winningham Trustee 20 September 2024
PADDINGTON DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Grace Reid Trustee 18 June 2024
PADDINGTON DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Christopher Ralph Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Duncan Everett Trustee 10 January 2024
None on record
Rajesh Makwana Trustee 30 August 2023
CVS BRENT
Received: On time
Shaun Browne Trustee 31 July 2023
None on record
Michelle Butler Trustee 10 July 2023
None on record
Emma Gerald Trustee 16 May 2023
None on record
David Thomas Hirschmann Trustee 21 February 2021
None on record
PATRICK STREET BA, JD Trustee 18 May 2020
None on record
Todd Brooks Benjamin Trustee 14 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.53m £5.32m £2.87m £3.72m £4.13m
Total expenditure £1.07m £1.99m £2.88m £3.48m £4.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £51.66k £334.77k £143.37k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.50m £5.28m £2.84m £2.04m £1.98m
Income - Other trading activities £7.76k £6.00k £9.91k £12.17k £1.25k
Income - Charitable activities £19.84k £27.92k £5.25k £1.63m £2.00m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £863 £4.91k £10.45k £32.35k £153.42k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.02m £1.88m £2.74m £3.23m £3.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £46.92k £109.83k £148.05k £248.53k £256.92k
Expenditure - Governance £6.69k £10.11k £13.87k £28.37k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £283.37k £683.35k £673.79k £779.61k £703.73k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £927.36k £3.90m £3.89m £4.09m £4.35m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £30.18k £71.93k £65.07k £137.11k £206.61k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 08 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit 8
Acton Park Estate
The Vale
LONDON
W3 7QE
Phone:
0207 041 8491