Accounts and annual returns SIASA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163650
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 March 2025 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 March 2025 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 March 2025 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 March 2025 407 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 February 2022 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 February 2022 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window