BOURNEMOUTH SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance and diffuse the knowledge of the religious philosophy of Spiritualism. The Church provides a comprehensive and wide programme of activities and events to a cross section of the public through Spiritualist teaching of divine services, spiritual awareness meetings, spiritual healing, discussion groups and workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 July 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Emily Mae | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Moore-Hill | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Moore-Hill | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN GOURLAY | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nigel West | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARJORIE MACHIN | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE ASTIN BRAMHILL | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Lee | Trustee | 31 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.16k | £12.77k | £69.80k | £26.66k | £33.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.06k | £20.23k | £17.38k | £36.12k | £28.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SNU SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
F6 Pine Grange
Bath Road
BOURNEMOUTH
BH1 2PN
- Phone:
- 01202551751
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window