Financial history FLEETWOOD SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1162209
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.21k £3.19k £7.62k £11.78k £17.83k
Total expenditure £9.16k £6.75k £8.57k £9.34k £10.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A