Trustees FLEETWOOD SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1162209

Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR HOUGH SHAW | Chair | 23 March 1992 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Cornwell | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP THOMPSON | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHAUN CHRISTOPHER HAGUE | Trustee | 22 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE MAUREEN HOLDEN | Trustee | 23 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN CHRISTINE HATHERLEY | Trustee | 22 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
BETTY COWELL | Trustee | 22 March 1995 |
|
|
||||
LINDA SHAW | Trustee | 24 March 1993 |
|
|
||||
VIOLET ANITA COMER | Trustee | 24 March 1985 |
|
|
||||
MURIEL RAINGER | Trustee | 21 March 1983 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.